Financial history THE BRITANNIA AIRCRAFT PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1004012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £412 £305 £200 £55 £23
Total expenditure £1.02k £679 £704 £643 £596
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A