Financial history ROBERT AND SUSAN SYKES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1004073
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/07/2016 23/07/2017 23/07/2018 23/07/2019 23/07/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £5.00k £921 £0
Total expenditure £1.06k £1.21k £864 £1.69k £3.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A