Financial history FRIENDS OF BROUGHTON HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1004174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £192 £122 £1.25k £0 £10.50k
Total expenditure £1.89k £123 £81 £0 £8.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A