Accounts and annual returns CHILDRENS CHRONIC ARTHRITIS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1004200
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 October 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2018 06 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 06 August 2019 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2017 14 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 14 September 2018 On Time