Accounts and annual returns AMRITA DZONG

Charity number: 1004520
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 May 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 08 May 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2022 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 08 May 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 May 2020 Not Required