Trustees GUESTLING BRADSHAW PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1004526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Mannering Chair 10 October 2018
None on record
Hannah Stevens Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Eve Elphick Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Charlie Cornford Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Matthew Collins Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Raymond Heyes Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Stuart Old Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
CHARLOTTE CUFF Trustee 30 June 2011
None on record