Accounts and annual returns NEWNHAM EARLY BIRDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1004539
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 May 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 June 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 June 2017 22 days late
Annual return 31 July 2015 27 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 27 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2014 27 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 27 May 2015 On Time