Accounts and annual returns RADIANT LIFE MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 1004581
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 01 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 14 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required