Financial history MOOR HALL SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1004613
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.53k £10.71k £7.55k £12.13k £21.61k
Total expenditure £4.15k £24.85k £6.47k £14.50k £23.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A