Accounts and annual returns DASHWOOD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1005376
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 18 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 30 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required