Accounts and annual returns BUNBURY JUBILEE PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 1005381
Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 February 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2022 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required