Financial history THE BERITH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1005582
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £35.73k £0 £731 £1 £0
Total expenditure £1.20m £2.65k £481 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0