Financial history EXMOOR CALVERT TRUST

Charity number: 1005776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £888.97k £1.71m £1.34m £1.40m £2.37m
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.21m £1.68m £1.75m £1.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £267.24k £167.72k £6.00k £3.83k £69.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £656.05k £779.54k £278.05k £202.40k £1.09m
Income - Other trading activities £750 £468 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £210.83k £430.41k £1.02m £1.14m £1.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £153 £64 £982 £4.87k £4.62k
Income - Other £21.19k £494.84k £35.83k £46.15k £154.91k
Income - Legacies £43.02k £0 £5.13k £3.86k £72.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.16m £1.57m £1.68m £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £64.35k £51.25k £108.76k £72.17k £87.13k
Expenditure - Governance £6.84k £6.84k £6.96k £7.14k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0