Financial history TICKENHAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1005845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.38k £1.48k £8.88k £9.18k £17.84k
Total expenditure £6.05k £3.07k £4.28k £8.23k £12.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A