Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN W DOORLY TRUST

Charity number: 1006077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required