Financial history WILLESBOROUGH INFANT SCHOOL SUPPORTERS

Charity Number: 1006081
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £13.33k £12.33k £1.51k £2.56k £1.45k
Total expenditure £10.72k £12.84k £4.43k £916 £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A