Financial history BROADMEAD CHURCH

Charity number: 1006096
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/10/2019
Total gross income £49.33k £66.38k £66.55k £52.71k £18.49k
Total expenditure £44.07k £45.56k £67.36k £92.35k £430.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A