Financial history OAKHURST PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1006175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £2.46k £1.35k £3.36k £3.32k
Total expenditure £162 £3.31k £226 £5.73k £2.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A