Accounts and annual returns BROOMFIELD HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1006232
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 12 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 16 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 22 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 04 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required