Accounts and annual returns MICHAEL SHAPIRO FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1006731
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 28 March 2005 11 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2004 06 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2004 Not Required