Financial history St Anne's Church of England Primary School Parent Teacher Friends Association

Charity number: 1006993
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.19k £10.43k £0 £6.50k £18.51k
Total expenditure £17.85k £11.25k £0 £3.25k £14.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £189
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A