Financial history FRIENDS OF HEYGARTH

Charity Number: 1007407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2020 30/10/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.10k £3.19k £9.16k £16.46k £15.46k
Total expenditure £1.86k £2.38k £5.85k £12.97k £18.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A