Financial history 8TH WOLVERHAMPTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1007503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.80k £13.48k £16.98k £15.55k £16.71k
Total expenditure £13.80k £5.53k £19.43k £18.16k £20.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £1.50k N/A