Accounts and annual returns FREELAND SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1007601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2021 05 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2019 14 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 Not Required