Trustees EAST GRIMSTEAD READING ROOM
Charity number: 1008159

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY NEWMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jenifer Louise Hiles | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kim Rosemarie Thompson | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gail Richardson | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Russell King | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|||||
MARIA HAYWARD | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM FRANCIS | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE BAILEY | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY COOPER | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Dalziel | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE HILL | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BEAUCHAMP | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.