Financial history FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL BONSAI COLLECTION

Charity Number: 1008283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2019 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £785 £440 £655 £1.22k £915
Total expenditure £339 £375 £409 £385 £425
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A