Trustees LITTLE OAKS COMMUNITY NURSERY
Charity number: 1008361

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Carter | Chair | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Rae | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Victoria Angelov | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Gregory | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Harris | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Reynolds | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Doe | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Pergjoka | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lanzon-Whates | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.