Trustees THE HARROW UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1009872

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Chalmers | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Francis Monteiro | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hilary Banks | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA TAYLOR | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nita Patel | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Margaret Westhead | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Sillifant | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Krutsnadeek Buddhdev | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Greenwood | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bennett | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Tanna | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen West | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FIELD | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GERRARD | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.