Charity overview THE CHURCH HOUSES

Charity number: 202007-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 7 DECEMBER 1937 AS VARIED 29 MARCH 1960 AND 8 AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
ONE HALF THE INCOME FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST ALDATE, OXFORD. ONE HALF THE INCOME FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN THE CITY OF OXFORD WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ST ALDATE
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 19 January 1962: Standard registration
  • 27 April 2000: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 27 April 2000: Funds transferred to 1080062 ST ALDATES PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of