Accounts and annual returns WINGATE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1010061
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2007 22 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2006 09 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2005 15 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2004 24 February 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2004 Not Required