Financial history THE CLINICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1010090
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £56.63k £50.38k £27.17k £40.64k £18.43k
Total expenditure £57.01k £50.41k £27.12k £40.83k £19.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A