Accounts and annual returns THE FLORENCE WILSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 1010535
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 November 2012 | 12 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 November 2011 | 30 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 November 2010 | 12 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 November 2009 | 30 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2009 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window