Accounts and annual returns BARLEY LANE PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1010637
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 April 2022 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 April 2022 673 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required