Financial history EASTBURN PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1010800
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £50 £0 £19.41k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £186 £50 £19.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.36k