Financial history OLDFIELDS HALL MIDDLE SCHOOL PSFA

Charity number: 1011148
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.07k £0 £0 £471 £518
Total expenditure £2.09k £0 £1.11k £2.33k £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A