Accounts and annual returns HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION OF THE GIGMILL PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1011225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 February 2025 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 February 2025 607 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 February 2025 972 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required