Accounts and annual returns IDEASUK (THE UK ASSOCIATION OF SUGGESTION SCHEMES)

Charity number: 1011439
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 11 April 2017 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 11 April 2017 315 days late
Annual return 31 March 2014 08 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 08 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 20 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 20 January 2014 On Time