Financial history GREENHILL SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity Number: 1011707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £33.09k £16.09k £18.67k £18.50k £36.44k
Total expenditure £24.58k £9.34k £23.00k £22.94k £35.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.05k £250 N/A £350