Financial history EATON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1013209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.10k £15.60k £1.11k £15.79k £11.66k
Total expenditure £12.95k £8.56k £5.22k £13.72k £5.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £250 N/A N/A N/A