Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LTD

Charity Number: 1013229
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 01 April 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2004 17 January 2005 On Time