Accounts and annual returns REFUGEE ARRIVALS PROJECT

Charity number: 1013556
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 29 July 2008 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 29 July 2008 90 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 01 June 2006 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 May 2006 94 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 05 April 2005 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 05 April 2005 64 days late