Accounts and annual returns ROCK CAMP TRUST

Charity Number: 1013576
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 07 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 05 August 2009 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 23 July 2008 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required