Financial history WOODTHORPE TENANTS AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT USER GROUP

Charity number: 1013818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £2.00k £2.01k £15.86k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.74k