Accounts and annual returns CARILA

Charity Number: 1014650
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 December 2015 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 15 December 2015 318 days late
Annual return 31 March 2013 19 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 19 December 2013 On Time