Financial history 4TH MORETON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1014827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.87k £14.46k £11.82k £18.48k £19.22k
Total expenditure £14.82k £4.21k £12.38k £15.38k £17.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A