Financial history ASSOCIATION OF DRESS HISTORIANS

Charity number: 1014876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.91k £22.44k £20.45k £11.50k £17.28k
Total expenditure £8.12k £5.20k £10.08k £14.12k £18.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A