Accounts and annual returns KENT DEAF CHILDRENS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 August 2024 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 March 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required