Trustees STALBRIDGE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1015268

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Westell | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Hicks | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Trim | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Coughlin | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Simpson | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Hampton | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Gallagher | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Coley | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA CHANT | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.