Financial history EASTBOURNE CORNFIELD WOMENS INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1015276
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £4.98k £5.28k £5.28k £2.19k £4.04k
Total expenditure £4.82k £5.17k £5.17k £2.18k £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A