Financial history UTICA CHAPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1015486
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £241 £150 £28 £143 £40.00k
Total expenditure £713 £851 £760 £886 £3.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A